EP1900905 - Airfoil thermal management with microcircuit cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 1 Financial Building 1 Financial Plaza Hartford Connecticut 06101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 1 Financial Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford Connecticut 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cunha, Francisco J. 5 Bruce Lane Avon CT, 06001 / US | 02 /
Dahmer, Matthew T. 1A Aris Way Milford MA, 01757 / US | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/12] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253638.6 | 13.09.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | US20060520374 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: US 520374 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1900905 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1900905 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900905 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2214 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2012/09] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaufelblattwärmeregelung mit Mikrokanalkühlung | [2012/12] | English: | Airfoil thermal management with microcircuit cooling | [2008/12] | French: | Gestion thermique d'une aube avec refroidissement par microcircuit | [2012/12] |
Former [2008/12] | Tragflächenwärmeregelung mit Mikrokanalkühlung | ||
Former [2008/12] | Gestion thermique de surface portante dotée de refroidissement de microcircuit | Examination procedure | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 23.12.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2246174 (ROLLS ROYCE [GB]) [X] 1-8,10-19 * page 4, line 4 - page 6, line 18; figures 1-4 * [I] 9; | [X]US2001018021 (ANDING DIRK [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2001018021 | GB2246174 |