EP1930631 - Gear position determination apparatus for manual transmission, gear-shift prompting apparatus for vehicle and method therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinoshita, Tomonori c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
Kinoshita, Tomonori c/o Toyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [2012/24] |
Former [2008/24] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254697.1 | 04.12.2007 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | JP20060327772 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006327772 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1930631 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1930631 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930631 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/70, B60W50/08, F16H63/42, // F16H59/68 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
F16H63/42 (EP);
B60W2510/0225 (EP);
B60W2510/0638 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
F16H2059/6807 (EP);
F16H2059/6823 (EP);
F16H2059/706 (EP);
F16H2063/426 (EP);
F16H59/70 (EP);
F16H61/0213 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | F16H59/70, B60W50/08, F16H63/42 | Designated contracting states | DE [2012/23] |
Former [2011/14] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gangpositionsbestimmungsvorrichtung für Handschaltgetriebe, Gangschaltungsaufforderungsvorrichtung für Fahrzeuge und Verfahren dafür | [2008/24] | English: | Gear position determination apparatus for manual transmission, gear-shift prompting apparatus for vehicle and method therefore | [2008/24] | French: | Appareil de détermination de position de rapport de vitesse pour transmission manuelle, appareil d'avertissement de changement de vitesse et procédé associé | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5921135 (FRIEDRICH ARNO [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US4803898 (HIBINO YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5436833 (JANECKE DANIEL P [US]) [A] 6-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006234831 (WHEELER ROBERT S [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6345216 (MORIMOTO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 11, line 40 - column 13, line 42; figures 13,14 * | by applicant | JP2003019912 | JPH05180339 | JPS6294428 | JPH04171352 |