Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8220427 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2012 | B2 | US2011011358 | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0624438 | 07.12.2006 | US87784707 | 24.10.2007 | US89103310 | 27.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7841310 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2010 | B2 | US2008135118 | 12.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0624438 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1930560 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2011 | B1 | EP1930560 | 01.09.2010 | A3 | EP1930560 | 11.06.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0624438 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2444504 | 06.04.2011 | B | GB2444504 | 11.06.2008 | A | GB0624438D0 | 17.01.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0624438 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2444607 | 21.12.2011 | B | GB2444607 | 11.06.2008 | A | GB0722928D0 | 02.01.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0624438 | 07.12.2006 |