EP2015171 - Montgomery modular exponentiation secured against hidden-channel attacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/03] | Cryptographic method comprising secure modular exponentiation against hidden-channel attacks without the knowledge of the public exponent, cryptoprocessor for implementing the method and associated chip card | ||
[2010/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Change - German title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | 17.09.2010 | Change - English title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | 17.09.2010 | Change - French title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMPLUS Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de Gémenos 13420 Gémenos / FR | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feix, Benoît Résidence Cytharista Av. Cytharista 13600 La Ciotat / FR | 02 /
Ciet, Mathieu 119/3C La Désirade Résidence l'Ile Heureuse Allée de la Mer 83270 St Cyr sur Mer / FR | [2009/03] | Application number, filing date | 07301194.2 | 29.06.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015171 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G06F7/728 (EP,US);
H04L9/003 (EP,US);
H04L9/302 (EP,US);
G06F2207/7219 (EP,US);
G06F7/723 (EP,US);
H04L2209/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gegen Angriffe mit verborgenen Kanälen gesicherte modulare Potenzierung nach Montgomery | [2010/42] | English: | Montgomery modular exponentiation secured against hidden-channel attacks | [2010/42] | French: | Mise à la puissance modulaire selon Montgomery sécurisée contre les attaques à canaux cachés | [2010/42] |
Former [2009/03] | Kryptographieverfahren, das eine gesicherte modulare Potenzierung gegen Angriffe mit verborgenen Kanälen ohne Kenntnis des öffentlichen Exponenten umfasst, Kryptoprozessor zur Umsetzung des Verfahrens und dazugehörige Chipkarte | ||
Former [2009/03] | Cryptographic method comprising secure modular exponentiation against hidden-channel attacks without the knowledge of the public exponent, cryptoprocessor for implementing the method and associated chip card | ||
Former [2009/03] | Procédé cryptographique comprenant une exponentiation modulaire sécurisée contre les attaques à canaux cachés sans la connaissance de l'exposant public, cryptoprocesseur pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé et carte à puce associée | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005048008 (MILSYS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * page 11, line 12 - page 16 *; | [A]EP1239364 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 2-5 * figures 9,10,13,14 * | [A] - MENEZES ALFRED J ET AL, HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY, CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICES AND ITS APPLICATIONS, BOCA RATON, FL, CRC PRESS, USA, (1997), ISBN 0-8493-8523-7, pages 613 - 629, XP002188328 [A] 2-5 * algorithms 14.82, 14.85 and 14.94 * |