EP2122817 - DRIVE FOR A PHASE MODULE BRANCH OF A MULTILEVEL CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMMASCHK, Mike Hauptstrasse 29a 01945 Guteborn / DE | 02 /
DORN, Jörg Mozartstrasse 19 96155 Buttenheim / DE | 03 /
EULER, Ingo Spitzwegstrasse 6 91056 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
LANG, Jörg Kronacher Strasse 14 95346 Stadtsteinach / DE | 05 /
TU, Quoc-Buu Sichersdorfer Strasse 28 90574 Rosstal / DE | 06 /
WÜRFLINGER, Klaus Poppenreuther Strasse 49a 90419 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/48] | Application number, filing date | 07702379.4 | 17.01.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007DE00099 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008086760 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2122817 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2122817 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02M7/483 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
H02M7/483 (EP,US);
H02M7/4835 (EP,US);
H02M1/0003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | H02M7/483 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANSTEUERUNG EINES PHASENMODULZWEIGES EINES MULTILEVEL-STROMRICHTERS | [2009/48] | English: | DRIVE FOR A PHASE MODULE BRANCH OF A MULTILEVEL CONVERTER | [2009/48] | French: | ASSERVISSEMENT D'UNE BRANCHE DE MODULE DE PHASE D'UN CONVERTISSEUR À PLUSIEURS NIVEAUX | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2007 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | AT | 17.01.2018 | IE | 17.01.2018 | LU | 17.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1541407 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO [JP]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4 * * claim 1 ** paragraphs [0015] , [0022] , [0026] , [0028] *; | [DYA] - LESNICAR A ET AL, "A new modular voltage source inverter topology", (2003), URL: http://www.unibw.de/eit62/forsch/SP/M2LC/m2lcveroef, (20071010), XP002454302 [DY] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2,10 * * paragraph [02.1] * [A] 2-7 |