|
13.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
29.11.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2019 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
30.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
07.12.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
273 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
34 |