EP1969448 - NETWORK USER DATABASE FOR A SIDEBAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWENS, Stephen 157 McDonald Street Marietta, GA 30064 / US | 02 /
BISHOP, Marc 230 Leland Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
WHITTLE, Derrick 3240 Countryside Drive Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Pelly, Jason Charles, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Pelly, Jason Charles, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/37] | Sessford, Russell, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07709909.1 | 02.01.2007 | [2008/38] | WO2007US60010 | Priority number, date | US20060326137 | 04.01.2006 Original published format: US 326137 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007079463 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1969448 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (KR);
G06F3/04842 (US);
H04L65/40 (KR);
H04L67/75 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | G06F3/048 | ||
Former IPC [2008/38] | G06F3/00, G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | NETZWERKBENUTZERDATENBANK FÜR EINE SEITENLEISTE | [2008/38] | English: | NETWORK USER DATABASE FOR A SIDEBAR | [2008/38] | French: | BASE DE DONNEES UTILISATEUR EN RESEAU POUR BARRE LATÉRALE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 25.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005050301 (WHITTLE DERRICK WANG [US], et al) [X] 1-17,19-29,32-35,37,38,43,44,47-52,54-56,59-63 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0114] * * figures 1,2,3b,3c,3d,3h * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0149] - paragraph [0151] * * figure 11 *; | [X]US2005060655 (GRAY SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,32-38,48-56,60-63 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012] ** paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0063] * | International search | [Y]US2005091674 (KNIGHT HOLLY [US], et al); | [X]US2005227216 (GUPTA PUNEET K [US]); | [Y]US2005289559 (ILLOWSKY DANIEL [US], et al); | [A] - SHAHAR ET AL., "Intelligent visualization and exploration of time-oriented clinical data", SYSTEM SCIENCES, 1999. HICSS-32. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 32ND ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, vol. TRACK4, page 12, URL: http://www.csdl2.computer/org/comp/proceedings/hicss/1999/0001/04/00014019.PDF, XP008129117 |