|
16.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Closing of application |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.11.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.10.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.06.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2011 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2010 |
(Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2010 |
(Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2008 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2008 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.05.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.05.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.05.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
09.01.2008 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
09.01.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
04.01.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.10.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |