EP2049320 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING THE TEMPERATURE OF MOLDS, DIES, AND INJECTION BARRELS USING FLUID MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MoldCool International, LLC 33 Hillside Drive Hollis NH 03049 / US | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Kenneth E. 33 Hillside Drive Hollis, NH 03049 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Protector IP AS Pilestredet 33 0166 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Protector IP Consultants AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2009/17] | Coward, Bjarne G., et al Protector IP Consultants AS P.O. Box 5074 Majorstuen 0301 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 07717608.9 | 13.02.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US62023 | Priority number, date | US20060352894 | 13.02.2006 Original published format: US 352894 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007095515 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049320 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049320 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/92, B29C45/00, G05D23/19, B29C45/73, B29C35/00 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B29C35/007 (EP,US);
B29C45/7306 (EP,US);
G05D23/1919 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76545 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76782 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | B29C47/92 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER TEMPERATUR VON FORMWERKZEUGEN, GESENKEN UND EINSPRITZZYLINDERN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN MEDIEN | [2009/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING THE TEMPERATURE OF MOLDS, DIES, AND INJECTION BARRELS USING FLUID MEDIA | [2009/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉGULATION DE TEMPÉRATURE DE MOULES, DE MATRICES ET DE CYLINDRES D'INJECTION À L'AIDE D'UN MILIEU FLUIDIQUE | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 23.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 17.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 23.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 23.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 23.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 23.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2011 | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2012 | 28.02.2017 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2007 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | CY | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4318874 (LEMELSON JEROME H) [X] 1,9,15 * figures 1, 2 * * column 6, lines 23-47 * * abstract * [Y] 2,12,14 [I] 3-8,10,11,13,16-18; | [XYI]US4768484 (SCARSELLETTA LOUIS [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * column 4, lines 21-68 * * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 65 * [Y] 2,12,14 [I] 2-8,10,11,13; | [Y]US2937506 (STIRLEN EUGENE D) [Y] 2,12,14 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 75; figures 1-6 *; | [IY]US6312628 (WIEDER HORST K [US], et al) [I] 1,3-11,13,15-18 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * column 2, lines 3-32 * * column 5, lines 13-47 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 66 * * column 12, line 19 - column 16, line 60 * [Y] 2,12,14 | International search | [Y]US6312628 (WIEDER HORST K [US], et al); | [Y]US4278230 (ALLEN PAUL E); | [Y]US4318874 (LEMELSON JEROME H); | [Y]US4680001 (WATERS MICHAEL A [US]) | Examination | DE4436117 | by applicant | US4318874 | US4768484 | US2937506 |