blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2010585

EP2010585 - HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT COUPLED BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kraton Polymers U.S. LLC
Westhollow Technology Center 3333 Highway 6 South
Houston TX 77082 / US
[2009/02]
Inventor(s)01 / MUYLDERMANS, Xavier, Daniel, Dominique, Jean
Brussels Business Centre Axis Parc, Building B 2nd Floor 1, rue Emile Francqui
B-1435 Mont St. Guibert / BE
02 / COIGNOUL, Emmanuelle
Brussels Business Centre Axis Parc, Building B 2nd Floor 1, rue Emile Francqui
B-1435 Mont St. Guibert / BE
03 / MAYENEZ, Catherine, Jeanne, Solange
Brussels Business Centre Axis Parc, Building B 2nd Floor 1, rue Emile Francqui
B-1435 Mont St. Guibert / BE
 [2009/02]
Representative(s)Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A.
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/02]Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A.
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. Postbus 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date07724656.920.04.2007
[2009/02]
WO2007EP03727
Priority number, dateEP2006011287221.04.2006         Original published format: EP 06112872
[2009/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2007122014
Date:01.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2010585
Date:07.01.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2010585
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.11.2007
ClassificationIPC:C08F297/04, C08L53/02
[2009/02]
CPC:
C08L53/02 (EP,BR,KR,US); C08F297/04 (BR,KR); C08F297/044 (EP,US);
C08L53/025 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08L53/025, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF BASIS VON HOCHMOLEKULAREN GEKOPPELTEN BLOCKCOPOLYMEREN[2009/02]
English:HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT COUPLED BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS[2009/02]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE COPOLYMÈRES À BLOCS COUPLÉS DE MASSE MOLÉCULAIRE ÉLEVÉE[2009/02]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2008National basic fee paid 
27.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/02]
03.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2009Fee for grant paid
20.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.09.2009
BE09.09.2009
BG09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IT09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
MT09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
TR09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
HU10.03.2010
IE20.04.2010
LU20.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT09.09.2009
BE09.09.2009
BG09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IT09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
MT09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
HU10.03.2010
IE20.04.2010
LU20.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/42]AT09.09.2009
BE09.09.2009
BG09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IT09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
MT09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
HU10.03.2010
IE20.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/41]AT09.09.2009
BE09.09.2009
BG09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IT09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
MT09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
IE20.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/25]AT09.09.2009
BE09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IT09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
MT09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
IE20.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/43]AT09.09.2009
BE09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
Former [2010/30]AT09.09.2009
BE09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
Former [2010/28]BE09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
Former [2010/27]CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
IS09.01.2010
PT11.01.2010
Former [2010/18]CY09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
LT09.09.2009
LV09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
PL09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1103577  (ZEON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0051]; example -; claim 1 *;
 [X]US2003225210  (HANDLIN DALE LEE [US], et al) [X] 12* claim - *;
 [X]US2005154144  (ATWOOD HARVEY E [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0010] , [0014] , [0027] , [0028] , [0043] , [0049]; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.