|
31.08.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.04.2017 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
15 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
20.02.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.05.2016 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2013 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.09.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |