|
04.10.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
15.09.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
09.06.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
09.06.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
65 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2016 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.07.2016 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.07.2016 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.04.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
89 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
115 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Published international application - A9 |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.12.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.09.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.09.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.09.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
34 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |