EP2033480 - Volume and tone control in direct digital speakers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/11] | VOLUME AND TONE CONTROL IN DIRECT DIGITAL SPEAKERS | ||
[2011/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audio Pixels Ltd. 3 Pekris St. Rehovot 76702 / IL | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Audio Pixels Ltd. 22/5 Jabotinsky St. 63479 Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Yuval 38/14 Hanasei Harishon Street Rehovot 76302 / IL | 02 /
LEWIN, Daniel 17 Gordon Street Ramat Hasharon 47263 / IL | 03 /
KAPLAN, Shay 18 Hanita Street P.O.B. 171 23800 Givat Ela / IL | [2012/28] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
COHEN, Yuval 38/14 Hanasei Harishon Street Rehovot 76302 / IL | ||
02 /
LEWIN, Daniel 17 Gordon Street Ramat Hasharon 47263 / IL | |||
03 /
KAPLAN, Shay 18 Hanita Street P.O.B. 171 23800 Givat Ela / IL | |||
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
COHEN, Yuval 39/8 Rupin Street 78345 Rehovot / IL | ||
02 /
LEWIN, Daniel 22/5 Jabotinsky Street 63479 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
KAPLAN, Shay 18 Hanita Street P.O.B. 171 23800 Givat Ela / IL | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/11] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07736361.2 | 21.05.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007IL00621 | Priority number, date | US20060802126P | 22.05.2006 Original published format: US 802126 P | US20060872488P | 04.12.2006 Original published format: US 872488 P | US20070907450P | 02.04.2007 Original published format: US 907450 P | US20070924203P | 03.05.2007 Original published format: US 924203 P | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007135679 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2033480 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2033480 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/22, H04R3/04 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
H04R1/005 (EP,US);
H04R3/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/22 (KR);
H04R1/227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Title | German: | Lautstärke- und Tonregelung in Direkt-Digital-Lautsprechern | [2011/41] | English: | Volume and tone control in direct digital speakers | [2011/41] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de commande de volume pour haut-parleurs numériques directs | [2011/41] |
Former [2009/11] | LAUTSTÄRKE- UND TONREGELUNG IN DIREKT-DIGITAL-LAUTSPRECHERN | ||
Former [2009/11] | VOLUME AND TONE CONTROL IN DIRECT DIGITAL SPEAKERS | ||
Former [2009/11] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE VOLUME POUR HAUT-PARLEURS NUMÉRIQUES DIRECTS | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2007 | AT | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | IT | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MC | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5574792 (KONNO FUMIYASU [JP]) [A] 1,10,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6094116 (TAI YU-CHONG [US], et al) [A] 11 * column 4, lines 59-63 ** abstract *; | [DA]US2002106093 (AZIMA FARAD [GB], et al) [DA] 11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0017] - [0023] - [0040] - [0043]; figure 9 *; | [A]GB2393601 (1 LTD [GB]) [A] 1,10,11,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004122543 (LEE BYEONG-CHANG [KR], et al) [A] 1,10,13 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2005008171 (HOSOI SHINTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,13 * paragraphs [0044] - [0052]; figure 3 *; | [AD] - DIAMOND A M ET AL, "Digital sound reconstruction using arrays of cmos-mems microspeakers", TRANSDUCERS, SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS, 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, IEEE, (20030609), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7731-1, pages 238 - 241, XP010646513 [AD] 1,10,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SENSOR.2003.1215297 | by applicant | GB2393601 |