EP2124376 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, CLOCK, AND CLOCK CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHI, Masakazu c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/47] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
KISHI, Masakazu c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Lewin, David Nicholas Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07738726.4 | 15.03.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007JP55276 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008111229 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2124376 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2124376 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
H04J3/0685 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (EP,US);
H04M1/72409 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | H04L7/033 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/47] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ANORDNUNG, TAKT UND TAKTSTEUERUNG | [2009/48] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, CLOCK, AND CLOCK CONTROLLER | [2009/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, HORLOGE ET UNITÉ DE COMMANDE D'HORLOGE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2009 | Translation filed | 28.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 15.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2007 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | IT | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | GB | 15.03.2019 | IE | 15.03.2019 | LU | 15.03.2019 | MT | 15.03.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 15.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
MT | 15.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 15.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
MT | 15.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 15.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 15.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002089737 (SUGATA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [X]US2002159130 (SAKANO SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] * * figures 2-5 *; | [I]US2003198307 (NEILL TIMOTHY [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0048] * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2005128012 (CARESOSA MARIO [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] * | International search | [Y]JPH09130373 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004032429 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JP2004201119 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JPH1155118 | JP2000341119 | JP2001320275 | JP2005276179 |