EP2002813 - WATER VAPOR GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/51] | OPTIC WATER VAPOR GENERATOR | ||
[2018/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGAKI, Michihito c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-0044 / JP | 02 /
TAGAMI, Kyoko c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-0044 / JP | [2018/29] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
IGAKI, Michihito c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-0044 / JP | ||
02 /
TAGAMI, Kyoko c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-0044 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/29] |
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07740577.7 | 30.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007JP57141 | Priority number, date | JP20060097590 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006097590 | [2008/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007114352 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002813 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2002813 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002813 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/04, A61F7/00, A61F7/03 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
A61F7/034 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0062 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | A61F9/04, A61F7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/29] |
Former [2009/18] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERDAMPFGENERATOR | [2018/12] | English: | WATER VAPOR GENERATOR | [2018/12] | French: | GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR D'EAU | [2018/12] |
Former [2008/51] | OPTISCHER WASSERDAMPFGENERATOR | ||
Former [2008/51] | OPTIC WATER VAPOR GENERATOR | ||
Former [2008/51] | GENERATEUR OPTIQUE DE VAPEUR D'EAU | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2008 | Translation filed | 02.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 01.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1393699 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-8,10,11 * figures 1x-5 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * [Y] 2,3; | [I]EP1147752 (KAO CORP [JP]) [I] 1-11 * figures 1a-3b * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0069] *; | [X]WO2005011543 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] * * figures 1,5b,10 *; | [Y]US2005192653 (TSUNAKAWA SATOSHI [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1,2 * * page 5 * * paragraph [0020] *; | [A]EP1090614 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004098072 (TONE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1a,2a,3a * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A]WO9951174 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 2 * page 13, line 12 - page 14, line 25 * * figure 2b * | International search | [X]JP2002065714 (KAO CORP); | [Y]WO2005058213 (KAO CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2002078728 (KAO CORP) | Examination | EP1782774 | WO2006006651 | by applicant | JP2002065714 | JP2004073688 | JP2003102761 |