EP2009080 - METHOD FOR SEPARATION OF METHANE, METHANE SEPARATOR, AND METHANE UTILIZATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiyo Nippon Sanso Corporation 3-26, Koyama 1-chome Shinagawa Tokyo 142-8558 / JP | For all designated states Research Institute Of Innovative Technology For The Earth 9-2, Kizugawadai Kizugawa-shi, Kyoto 619-0292 / JP | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMIOKA, Takafumi TAIYO NIPPON SANSO CORPORATION 3-26, Koyama 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-8558 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Toshiyuki TAIYO NIPPON SANSO CORPORATION 3-26, Koyama 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-8558 / JP | 03 /
SAKAI, Toru TAIYO NIPPON SANSO CORPORATION 3-26, Koyama 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-8558 / JP | 04 /
MANO, Hiroshi Research Institute of Innovative Technology For the Earth 9-2, Kizugawadai Kizugawa-shi Kyoto 619-0292 / JP | 05 /
OKABE, Kazuhiro Research Institute of Innovative Technology For the Earth 9-2, Kizugawadai Kizugawa-shi Kyoto 619-0292 / JP | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07741000.9 | 04.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007JP57564 | Priority number, date | JP20060103665 | 04.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006103665 | [2009/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007116908 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009080 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C10L3/10, B01D19/00, B01D53/14, B01D61/00, B01D63/02, B01D71/26 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
B01D3/101 (EP,US);
C07C7/11 (US);
B01D19/0031 (EP,US);
B01D53/1425 (EP,US);
B01D53/1487 (EP,US);
B01D53/22 (EP,US);
B01D63/04 (EP,US);
C10L3/10 (EP,US);
C10L3/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2258/05 (EP,US);
B01D63/043 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/20] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON METHAN, METHANSEPARATOR UND METHANVERWENDUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/01] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATION OF METHANE, METHANE SEPARATOR, AND METHANE UTILIZATION SYSTEM | [2009/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA SÉPARATION DE MÉTHANE, SÉPARATEUR DE MÉTHANE ET SYSTÈME D'UTILISATION DE MÉTHANE | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2008 | Translation filed | 13.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 05.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/15] | 08.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4995888 (BEAUPRE RICHARD F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 7 *; | [A]WO9913962 (NORSKE STATS OLJESELSKAP [NO], et al) [A] 1-20* figure -; claim - *; | [I]WO2006004400 (TNO [NL], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 8 * * page 5, lines 5-10; claim - *; | [A]EP1634946 (RUETGERS CARBOTECH ENGINEERING [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] * | International search | [Y]JPH0498401U ; | [Y]JP2002363581 (TSUKISHIMA KIKAI CO); | [Y]WO2005089906 (TSUKISHIMA KIKAI CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2001293340 | JP2003204853 | JP2005270814 | JP2006103665 | - MASAAKI TERAMOTO ET AL., "Separation and enrichment of carbon dioxide by capillary membrane module with permeation of carrier solution", SEPARATION AND PURIFICATION TECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 30, pages 215 - 227 |