EP2023129 - SURFACE EXAMINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirin Techno-System Company, Limited 17-1, Namamugi 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0052 / JP | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKAMI, Yukiko c/o KIRIN TECHNO-SYSTEM COMPANY, LIMITED 17-1, Namamugi 1-chome, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0052 / JP | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07743476.9 | 16.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007JP60041 | Priority number, date | JP20060143181 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006143181 | JP20060258263 | 25.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006258263 | [2009/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007135915 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023129 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/954 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
G01N21/954 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/0004 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/60 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/8854 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2207/30164 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/25] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENUNTERSUCHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/07] | English: | SURFACE EXAMINING DEVICE | [2009/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXAMEN DE SURFACE | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2008 | Translation filed | 28.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 24.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003223631 (INE EIICHI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0132] *; | [A]US2004032979 (HONDA TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0043] * | International search | [A]JPS50158387 ; | [A]JPH08101130 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11211674 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JPH11281582 (TB OPTICAL KK); | [A]JPH11326226 (MEGA FLOAT GIJUTSU KENKYU KUMI) | by applicant | JP11281582B |