EP1996342 - PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICE WITH NANOSTRUCTURED LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | 06.07.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solexant Corporation 2385 Bering Drive San Jose CA 95131 / US | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDDY, Damoder 16457 West Mozart Avenue Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Pettenkoferstrasse 37 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07751007.1 | 12.02.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US04213 | Priority number, date | US20060772548P | 13.02.2006 Original published format: US 772548 P | US20060796820P | 02.05.2006 Original published format: US 796820 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007095386 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996342 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/12, H01L27/30, H01L51/42 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
H01L31/0296 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H10K30/57 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/0304 (EP,US);
H01L31/0322 (EP,US);
H01L31/0324 (EP,US);
H01L31/0352 (EP,US);
H01L31/0392 (EP,US);
H01L31/03923 (EP,US);
H01L31/03925 (EP,US);
H01L31/068 (EP,US);
H01L31/0687 (EP,US);
H01L31/072 (EP,US);
H01L31/0725 (EP,US);
H01L31/075 (EP,US);
H01L31/076 (EP,US);
H01L31/1804 (EP,US);
H01L31/1824 (EP,US);
H01L31/1836 (EP,US);
H01L31/1852 (EP,US);
H01L31/202 (EP,US);
H10K30/00 (US);
H10K30/10 (EP,KR,US);
H10K30/35 (EP,KR);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
H10K30/211 (EP,KR);
H10K30/40 (EP,KR);
H10K30/50 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/541 (EP,US);
Y02E10/544 (EP,US);
Y02E10/545 (EP,US);
Y02E10/547 (EP,US);
Y02E10/548 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | B05D5/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Title | German: | PHOTOVOLTAIKVORRICHTUNG MIT NANOSTRUKTURIERTEN SCHICHTEN | [2008/49] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICE WITH NANOSTRUCTURED LAYERS | [2008/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE DISPOSANT DE COUCHES NANOSTRUCTUREES | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 20.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/32] | 20.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004023527 (NANOSYS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0090] , [0115] * * paragraphs [0120] - [0139] * * paragraphs [0160] - [0166] ** figure 12; claims 4,5,11,32-35,46-55,60,89,93 *; | [XI]WO2005083811 (EVERGREEN SOLAR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * paragraphs [0027] - [0032]; figures 7,8 * * paragraphs [0036] , [0039] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0048] * [I] 4,11-15 | International search | [Y]US2004067324 (LAZAREV PAVEL I [US], et al); | [Y]US2004219348 (JACQUIOD CATHERINE [FR], et al); | [X]US2005126628 (SCHER ERIK C [US], et al); | [Y]US2005253502 (GOKTURK HALIT S [US]) |