EP1999742 - STRINGED MUSICAL INSTRUMENT USING SPRING TENSIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/50] | STRINGED MUSICAL INSTRUMENT USING SPRING TENSION | ||
[2020/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lyles, Cosmos 649 2nd Ave apt 4F New York, NY 10016 / US | [2021/08] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Lyles, Cosmos 101 3rd Avenue New York, NY 10003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWD, Paul Bronxville New York / US | 02 /
LYLES, Cosmos 649 2nd Ave apt 4F New York, NY 10016 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
DOWD, Paul Bronxville New York / US | ||
02 /
LYLES, Cosmos 101 3rd Avenue New York, NY 10003 / US | |||
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
DOWD, Paul Bronxville New York / US | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/08] |
Former [2008/50] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07753423.8 | 15.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US06794 | Priority number, date | US20060782602P | 15.03.2006 Original published format: US 782602 P | US20060830323P | 12.07.2006 Original published format: US 830323 P | US20060858555P | 10.11.2006 Original published format: US 858555 P | US20070880230P | 11.01.2007 Original published format: US 880230 P | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007106600 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1999742 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1999742 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G10D3/147, G10D3/12 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
G10D1/00 (EP,KR,US);
G10D3/12 (EP,KR,US);
G10D3/14 (KR,US);
G10D3/147 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | G10D3/12, G10D3/14 | ||
Former IPC [2008/50] | G10D3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAITENINSTRUMENT MIT SAITENSPANNER | [2020/33] | English: | STRINGED MUSICAL INSTRUMENT USING SPRING TENSIONER | [2020/33] | French: | INSTRUMENT MUSICAL À CORDES UTILISANT UN TENDEUR A RESSORT | [2020/33] |
Former [2008/50] | SAITENINSTRUMENT MIT FEDERSPANNUNG | ||
Former [2008/50] | STRINGED MUSICAL INSTRUMENT USING SPRING TENSION | ||
Former [2008/50] | INSTRUMENT MUSICAL À CORDES UTILISANT UNE TENSION DE RESSORT | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 14.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 28.03.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 02.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2007 | AT | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | IT | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | NL | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | IE | 15.03.2021 | LU | 15.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US936624 (HALE NOAH C [US]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-4,6 *; | [X]DE375206 (ALBERT BEYERMANN) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US2453572 (JOHN FERRIER DAVID) [X] 1-4,8,9,12-15 * columns 1,2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3437001 (KRAFT ARTHUR A) [X] 1-3 * columns 4-8; figures 4,5 *; | [X]JPS4822203B ([JP]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [XI]DE3607252 (PETER GERHARD) [X] 1-9,11-15 * columns 2,4-7; figures 6-8 * [I] 10; | [X]US5390579 (BURGON HAROLD S [GB]) [X] 1-3 * columns 1,3-5,8; figures 4,5 * * columns 10,11 *; | [X]GB2416069 (MERAK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,13-15 * pages 1-3,6,7; figures 3,4 * | International search | [Y]US936624 (HALE NOAH C [US]); | [Y]US1113390 (WENZEL-SCHMIDT HERMANN [US]); | [Y]US2130248 (PEATE GEORGE A); | [Y]US2514835 (ALFRED BREDICE); | [X]US5095797 (ZACAROLI EDWARD C [US]); | [Y]US5390579 (BURGON HAROLD S [GB]); | [Y]US6437226 (OUDSHOORN MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US2006117930 (FOLMAR JOE [US], et al) | by applicant | DE3607252 | US6437226 |