EP2020948 - TREATMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING PERIODONTAL DISEASE THROUGH APPLICATION OF HEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeno Corporation A Delaware Corporation 450 Gears Road Suite 600 Houston TX 77067 / US | [2009/08] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Tyrell, Inc. 515 West Greens Road Suite 725 Houston TX 770067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONRAD, Robert 8307 Drew Haven Lane Spring, TX 77379 / US | 02 /
CONRAD, Charles 5911 Harwick Drive Spring, TX 77379 / US | 03 /
KLEMP, Walter, V. 1973 West Clay Street Houston, TX 77019 / US | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07758619.6 | 15.03.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US64082 | Priority number, date | US20060429927 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 429927 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007133840 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020948 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61C3/00, A61C17/00 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A61C19/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61C19/00 (KR);
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0017 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON PARODONTALERKRANKUNG DURCH AUFBRINGEN VON WÄRME | [2009/07] | English: | TREATMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING PERIODONTAL DISEASE THROUGH APPLICATION OF HEAT | [2009/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT PERMETTANT DE TRAITER OU DE PRÉVENIR LA PARODONTOPATHIE PAR APPLICATION DE CHALEUR | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 27.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005064370 (DURET FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 42] , [0 50] , [0 62] , [0 67] - [0077] - [0 84] , [ 102] - [0105] - [ 108]; figure - *; | [XP]US2006234189 (DURET FRANCOIS [FR]) [XP] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US6471716 (PECUKONIS JOSEPH P [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-13 * column 3, lines 26-56; figures 2, 3 * * column 6, lines 26-30 * * column 10, lines 1-6 * * column 10, lines 37-50 * * column 12, line 6 - column 13, line 20; claims 1, 7, 15, 19, 23, 36 * | International search | [X]US2001038993 (LINDQUIST SHERRILL F [US]); | [X]US2001046654 (ZAVITSANOS PETER D [US], et al); | [Y]US2005048434 (CIPOLLA ANTHONY J [US], et al); | [Y]US6471716 (PECUKONIS JOSEPH P [US]); | [Y]US5047005 (CADWELL JOHN A [US]); | [Y]US6340301 (DARNELL DANIEL HENRY [US]); | [X] - MORITZ ET AL., "Studies of Thermal Injury", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (1947), vol. 23, pages 695 - 720, XP008099993 |