blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: WO2008006459 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   WO2008006459



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 173
02.07.2009 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
23.03.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 4
27.01.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
20.11.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.02.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
17.01.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.01.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.01.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 51
28.06.2007 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
28.06.2007 Claims PCT receiving Office 7
28.06.2007 Description PCT receiving Office 37
28.06.2007 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5