EP2069663 - PRESSURE COMPENSATION ELEMENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR PRESSURE COMPENSATION IN A HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUK, Detlef Badstr.20 77871 Renchen / DE | 02 /
WEGNER, Norbert Grassweg 36 77815 Buehl / DE | 03 /
MAIER, Gerald Hornisgrindestr. 8 77833 Ottersweier-Unzhurst / DE | 04 /
HUESGES, Mario Hindenburgstr. 67 77830 Buehlertal / DE | 05 /
MUELLER, Andreas Georg-Roemerstr. 3 76863 Herxheim / DE | 06 /
NEIGEL, Regina Oberhofstr. 6a 77815 Buehl / DE | [2009/25] | Application number, filing date | 07788085.4 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007EP57890 | Priority number, date | DE20061045996 | 27.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006045996 | DE20061062044 | 29.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006062044 | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008037528 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2069663 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2069663 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16K24/00, F21V31/03, F16H57/027, F16K24/04, H05K5/02, H02K5/10 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
F16K24/00 (EP,US);
F16H57/027 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/02 (KR);
B65D51/16 (KR);
F16K15/14 (KR);
F16K24/04 (EP,KR,US);
F21V31/03 (EP,KR,US);
H02K5/10 (EP,KR,US);
H05K5/0213 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | F16K24/00, F21V31/03, F16H57/027, F16K24/04, H05K5/02 | ||
Former IPC [2009/25] | F16K24/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKAUSGLEICHSELEMENT, INSBESONDERE ZUM DRUCKAUSGLEICH IN EINEM GEHÄUSE | [2009/25] | English: | PRESSURE COMPENSATION ELEMENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR PRESSURE COMPENSATION IN A HOUSING | [2009/25] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE COMPENSATION DE PRESSIONS, UTILISÉ EN PARTICULIER POUR LA COMPENSATION DE PRESSIONS DANS UN LOGEMENT | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2019 | 01.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2007 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | IT | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | AT | 31.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | IE | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | LU | 31.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
AT | 31.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
IE | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
AT | 31.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
IE | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
IE | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2526794 (ANDREWS JAMES F) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [X]US3845878 (CARLSON E) [X] 1* figure 5 *; | [X]US3908684 (SHORT EDWARD H) [X] 1 * figure 1 * | Examination | EP1363069 | by applicant | US2526794 | DE29511683U | DE19626792 |