Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2036552

EP2036552 - SENESCENCE INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.07.2019  [2019/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8210 / JP
[2018/30]
Former [2009/12]For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8210 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OTA, Noriyasu
Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
2606, Akabane
Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
02 / HARAMIZU, Satoshi
Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
2606, Akabane
Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
03 / MURASE, Takatoshi
Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
2606, Akabane
Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
 [2018/32]
Former [2009/12]01 / OTA, Noriyasu
Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2606, Akabane Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
02 / HARAMIZU, Satoshi
Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2606, Akabane Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
03 / MURASE, Takatoshi
Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2606, Akabane Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2018/32]
Former [2009/35]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2009/12]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date07790236.929.06.2007
[2009/12]
WO2007JP00716
Priority number, dateJP2006018546605.07.2006         Original published format: JP 2006185466
JP2006021796010.08.2006         Original published format: JP 2006217960
JP2006021814010.08.2006         Original published format: JP 2006218140
JP2007006352113.03.2007         Original published format: JP 2007063521
[2009/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008004340
Date:10.01.2008
Language:JA
[2008/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2036552
Date:18.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2036552
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:A23L2/38, A61K31/353, A61K36/00, A61K36/82, A61P43/00
[2018/12]
Former International [2009/45]A61K31/353, A23L1/30, A61K36/00, A61K36/82, A61P43/00
Former International [2009/12]A61K31/353, A23L1/30, A61K36/00, A61K36/18, A61P21/00, A61P43/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2018/32]
Former [2009/36]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2009/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENESZENZ-INHIBITOR[2009/12]
English:SENESCENCE INHIBITOR[2009/12]
French:INHIBITEUR DE LA SÉNESCENCE[2009/12]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2009Translation filed 
02.01.2009National basic fee paid 
02.01.2009Search fee paid 
02.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/12]
06.02.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.03.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.08.2009Observations by third parties
13.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.06.2018Fee for grant paid
12.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.06.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
28.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.04.2011
Opposition(s)09.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
19.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
24.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
25.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]US5788971  (TOGASAKI KEIICHI [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,10,15,17-20 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-60 * * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 10; claims 1-8 *;
 [X]US2004087516  (ROSENBLOOM RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1-6,10,16-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0031] , [0032] , [0059] *;
 [XP]WO2007006135  (H3 FORMULATIONS LTD [CA]; HEUER MARVIN A [CA]; MOLINO MICHELE [CA]) [XP] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2007042271  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]; RAEDERSTORFF DANIEL [FR]; WANG-SCHMIDT YING [CH) [XP] 1-10,16-20 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2007056307  (ROIZEN MICHAEL F [US]) [XP] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0017]; claims 1,5,16,17,25; table 5 *;
 [X]  - KUMARI M V ET AL, "Effect of "beta CATECHIN" on the life span of senescence accelerated mice (SAM-P8 strain).", BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY INTERNATIONAL APR 1997, (199704), vol. 41, no. 5, ISSN 1039-9712, pages 1005 - 1011, XP008111412 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [X]  - KOMATSU M ET AL, "The efficacy of an antioxidant cocktail on lipid peroxide level and superoxide dismutase activity in aged rat brain and DNA damage in iron-induced epileptogenic foci.", TOXICOLOGY 7 AUG 2000, (20000807), vol. 148, no. 2-3, ISSN 0300-483X, pages 143 - 148, XP008111397 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [X]  - BUETLER TIMO M ET AL, "Green tea extract decreases muscle necrosis in mdx mice and protects against reactive oxygen species.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION APR 2002, (200204), vol. 75, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9165, pages 749 - 753, XP002459513 [X] 1-10,17-20 * the whole document *
 [X]  - IWAI K ET AL, "Effect of tea catechins on mitochondrial DNA 4977-bp deletions in human leucocytes", MUTATION RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 595, no. 1-2, ISSN 0027-5107, (20060320), pages 191 - 195, (20060320), XP025250669 [X] 1-6,9,10,17-20,22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mrfmmm.2005.10.001
 [X]  - DORCHIES OLIVIER M ET AL, "Green tea extract and its major polyphenol (-)-epigallocatechin gallate improve muscle function in a mouse model for Duchenne muscular dystrophy", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY. CELL PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, US, (20060201), vol. 290, no. 2, ISSN 0363-6143, pages C616 - C625, XP002459514 [X] 1-6,9,10,17-20,22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpcell.00425.2005
 [X]  - MURASE TAKATOSHI ET AL, "Green tea extract improves running endurance in mice by stimulating lipid utilization during exercise.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY. REGULATORY, INTEGRATIVE AND COMPARATIVE PHYSIOLOGY JUN 2006, (200606), vol. 290, no. 6, ISSN 0363-6119, pages R1550 - R1556, XP008080359 [X] 1-10,16-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpregu.00752.2005
 [X]  - SINGAL A ET AL, "Green Tea Extract and Catechin Ameliorate Chronic Fatigue-Induced Oxidative Stress in Mice", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL FOOD, MARY ANN LIEBERT, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (20050101), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1096-620X, pages 47 - 52, XP003015493 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/jmf.2005.8.47
 [X]  - MOHD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Hab-e-Chai Deegar Qawi Tar", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL NA4/3925, (1928), pages 1 - 4, XP003025360 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MOHD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Habb-e-chai", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL NA4/3924, (1928), pages 1 - 3, XP003025359 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MOHD AKMAL KHAN, "Qahwah Bara-e-Faalij Wa Laqwa", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AH5/2667, (2000), pages 1 - 3, XP003025358 [X] 9,10,19,20 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MOHD AKMAL KHAN, "Qahwah Deegar bara-e-Faalij Wa Laqwa", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AH5/2668, (2000), pages 1 - 3, XP003025357 [X] 9,10,19,20 * the whole document *
International search[X]JPH10175858  (ITOEN KK);
 [X]JP2003286167  (CHUNG JOO HO, et al);
 [X]JP2004519241  ;
 [XP]US2007149466  (MILBURN MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [X]WO0121186  (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [X]WO2006051980  (KAO CORP [JP], et al);
 [XP]WO2007020917  (UNIV TOKUSHIMA [JP], et al);
 [X]JP2004331724  (ITOCHU SHIRYO);
 [X]WO2004037015  (NEW SUN NUTRITION COMPANY [US], et al)
 [Y]  - NAGASAWA T., "Haiyosei Kin Ishuku ni okeru Leucin Toyo ga Kokkakuhin Bunkai to Sanka Stress ni Oyobosu Eikyo (EFFECTS OF LEUCINE ADMINISTRATION ON PROTEIN DEGRADATION AND OXIDATIVE STRESS IN DUSUSE MUSCLE)", REPORTS OF THE RESEARCH COMMITEE OF ESSENTIAL AMINO ACIDS (JAPAN), (200603), vol. 175, pages 59 - 64, XP003007861
by applicantJP2004115438
 JP2004051580
 JP2006063038
 JP2003012539
 JP2005281285
 JPH1143432
 JP2003261456
 JP2004182705
 WO2005123058
 JP2001089387
 JP2004059518
 JPH1017585
 JP2006016409
 JP2002338464
 JP2005097273
 JP2006062976
 JPS60156614
 JPH04253918
 JPH04352726
 JP2005089384
 JP2006028194
 JP2000026290
 JP2000026289
 JPS59219384
 JPH0420589
 JPH05260907
 JPH05306279
 JP3742094B
 JP2002272373
 JP2006129738
    - "Iwanami Lectures, Gendai Igaku no Kiso", BASIC MODERN MEDICINE, (1999), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 55 - 58
    - DORCHIES O. M. ET AL., CELL PHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 290, no. 2, pages 616 - 25
    - BROUWER A. E. ET AL., PANCREAS, (1991), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 221 - 8
    - CROZIER S. J. ET AL., J. NUTR., (2005), vol. 135, no. 3, pages 376 - 82
other   - MOHD. AKMAL KHAN, "Qahwah Deegar bara-e-Faalij Wa Laqwa", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AH5/2668, pages 1 - 3, XP003025357
    - MOHD. AKMAL KHAN, "Qahwah Bara-e-Faalij Wa Laqwa", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AH5/2667, pages 1 - 3, XP003025358
    - MOHD. NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Habb-e-chai", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL NA4/3924, pages 1 - 3, XP003025359
    - MOHD. NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Hab-e-Chai Deegar Qawi Tar", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL NA4/3925, pages 1 - 4, XP003025360