|
17.11.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2022 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.11.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2022 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2022 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
103 |
|
15.09.2022 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
103 |
|
09.09.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
45 |
|
09.09.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2022 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.02.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
29 |
|
21.02.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
29 |
|
21.02.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.02.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
76 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
11.06.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
42 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
46 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.12.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Application refused (deficiency in sequence listing not remedied/non-payment of fee) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
25.09.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
88 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
28 |