EP2059598 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING AMPA RECEPTOR-MEDIATED EXCITOTOXICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre for Addiction and Mental Health 33 Russell Street Toronto, ON M5S 2S1 / CA | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Fang c/o Centre For Addiction and Mental Health 33 Russell Street Toronto, Ontario M5S 2S1 / CA | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/21] | 01 /
LIU, Fang c/o Centre For Addiction and Mental Health 33 Russell Street Toronto, Ontario M5S 2S1 / CA | Representative(s) | Murphy, Colm Damien Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/21] |
Former [2010/51] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2009/21] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07800563.4 | 31.08.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007CA01539 | Priority number, date | US20060841195P | 31.08.2006 Original published format: US 841195 P | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025163 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2059598 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2059598 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 06.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/53, A61K38/17, A61K48/00, A61P39/00, C07K14/47, C07K14/705, C07K17/00, C07K19/00, C12N15/12, C12N9/02 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/70571 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION VON AMPA-REZEPTOR-VERMITTELTER EXZITOTOXIZITÄT | [2009/21] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING AMPA RECEPTOR-MEDIATED EXCITOTOXICITY | [2009/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA MODULATION DE L'EXCITOTOXICITÉ INDUITE PAR LE RÉCEPTEUR AMPA | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2007 | AT | 19.03.2014 | BE | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | IT | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | MT | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | GB | 31.08.2014 | IE | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | LU | 31.08.2014 | FR | 01.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 31.08.2007 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
IE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
IE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
IE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
IE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - BERETTA F ET AL, "NSF interaction is important for direct insertion of GluR2 at synaptic sites", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR NEUROSCIENCES, SAN DIEGO, US, (20050401), vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 1044-7431, pages 650 - 660, XP004801864 [X] 1-2,10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mcn.2004.11.008 | [XI] - LEE SANG HYOUNG ET AL, "Clathrin adaptor AP2 and NSF interact with overlapping sites of GluR2 and play distinct roles in AMPA receptor trafficking and hippocampal LTD.", NEURON, (20021114), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0896-6273, pages 661 - 674, XP002555891 [X] 1-2 * the whole document * [I] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(02)01024-3 | International search | [X]US2003203372 (WARD NEIL RAYMOND [GB], et al); | [A]US2004086891 (TATTON WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [X]WO2005033311 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al); | [A] - CHUANG D.-M. ET AL., "Gyceraldehyde-3-phosphate dehydrogenase, apoptosis and neurodegenerative diseases", ANNUAL REVIEW OF PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, (20050207), vol. 45, pages 269 - 290, XP002362597 | [A] - AARTS M.M. ET AL., "Novel concepts in excitotoxic neurodegeneration after stroke", EXPERT IN REVIEWS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (20031216), vol. 5, no. 30, pages 1 - 22, XP008104853 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S1462399403007087 |