Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2054587

EP2054587 - TURBINE HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2018Revocation of patentpublished on 28.02.2018  [2018/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Turbo Systems AG
Bruggerstrasse 71a
5400 Baden / CH
[2009/19]
Inventor(s)01 / JARUSEL, Matthias
Schulstrasse 42
79774 Albbruck / DE
02 / DI PIETRO, Marco
Gilamstrasse 11a
4665 Oftringen / CH
03 / STÄDELI, Markus
Sonnenhaldenstrassse 3
8113 Boppelsen / CH
04 / NEUENSCHWANDER, Peter
Möhrlistrasse 101
8006 Zürich / CH
05 / PHILLIPSEN, Bent
Birchstrasse 19d
5406 Baden-Rütihof / CH
 [2009/19]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2009/19]ABB Patent Attorneys
c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date07802890.924.08.2007
[2009/19]
WO2007EP58849
Priority number, dateEP2006040536624.08.2006         Original published format: EP 06405366
EP2006040536524.08.2006         Original published format: EP 06405365
[2009/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008023068
Date:28.02.2008
Language:DE
[2008/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2054587
Date:06.05.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008
[2009/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2054587
Date:02.12.2009
Language:DE
[2009/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:F01D9/02, F02B37/00, F04D29/44
[2009/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2009/38]
Former [2009/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TURBINENGEHÄUSE[2009/19]
English:TURBINE HOUSING[2009/19]
French:BOÎTIER DE TURBINE[2009/19]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2009National basic fee paid 
17.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
25.03.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.04.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
04.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2009Fee for grant paid
26.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.08.2010  24.08.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Rolls-Royce Power Systems AG
Maybachplatz 1
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kordel, Mattias
Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
 [2014/14]
Former [2014/10]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2010  24.08.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Tognum AG
Maybachplatz 1
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kordel, Mattias
Gleiss & Grosse
Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/38]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2010   
Tognum AG
Maybachplatz 1
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
11.10.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.08.2011Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2011Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
24.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
16.05.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.05.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
27.11.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/09]
Appeal following opposition11.07.2013Appeal received No.  T1578/13
24.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
27.11.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
27.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DA]DE10137899  (MAN B & W DIESEL AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DD267079  (BERGMANN BORSIG VEB [DD]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 14 - paragraph 18; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1574681  (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020]; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB815475  (HENSCHEL & SOHN GES MIT BESCHR) [A] 1 * page 2, line 93 - line 101; figure 1 *