|
04.07.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Cancellation of communication under Rule 112(1) EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
04.07.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.06.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2016 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
65 |
|
02.02.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
05.11.2015 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
68 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
68 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
72 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2012 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
22 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |