EP2034893 - MEASURING TISSUE OXYGENATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOYEMI, Olusola, O. 2248 Whistler Drive Longmont, CO 80501 / US | 02 /
SOLLER, Babs, R. 15 Franklin Circle Northborough, Massachusetts 01532 / US | 03 /
YANG, Ye 23 Locust Street, First Floor Westbrook, Maine 04092 / US | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
SOYEMI, Olusola, O. 2248 Whistler Drive Longmont, CO 80501 / US | ||
02 /
SOLLER, Babs, R. 15 Franklin Circle Northborough, Massachusetts 01532 / US | |||
03 /
YANG, Ye 785 B Franklin Street Worcester, Massachusetts 01604 / US | |||
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
SOYEMI, Olusola, O. 38 Yorkshire Terrace Apt. 6 Shrewsbury, Massachusetts 01545 / US | ||
02 /
SOLLER, Babs, R. 15 Franklin Circle Northborough, Massachusetts 01532 / US | |||
03 /
YANG, Ye 785 B Franklin Street Worcester, Massachusetts 01604 / US | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07811963.3 | 30.05.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007US69997 | Priority number, date | US20060809238P | 30.05.2006 Original published format: US 809238 P | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007140422 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2034893 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2034893 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/1455, G01N21/35, G01N33/49 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (KR);
A61B5/412 (EP,US);
G01N33/4925 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3144 (EP,US);
G01N21/35 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | A61B5/1455 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | MESSUNG DER SAUERSTOFFANREICHERUNG VON GEWEBE | [2009/12] | English: | MEASURING TISSUE OXYGENATION | [2009/12] | French: | MESURE DE L'OXYGÉNATION DE TISSUS | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 23.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2007 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | LU | 30.05.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2006116569 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US], et al) [XP] 1-10,12,13 * the whole document *; | [X] - YANG YE ET AL, "Simultaneous correction of the influence of skin color and fat on tissue spectroscopy by use of a two-distance fiber-optic probe and orthogonalization technique", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050901), vol. 30, no. 17, doi:10.1364/OL.30.002269, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 2269 - 2271, XP009156876 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.30.002269 | [AD] - FINLAY JAROD C ET AL, "Hemoglobin oxygen saturations in phantoms and in vivo from measurements of steady-state diffuse reflectance at a single, short source-detector separation", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20040701), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1118/1.1760188, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 1949 - 1959, XP012074944 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.1760188 | [AD] - STRATONNIKOV A A ET AL, "Evaluation of blood oxygen saturation in vivo from diffuse reflectance spectra", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, (20011001), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1117/1.1411979, ISSN 1083-3668, pages 457 - 467, XP009156939 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.1411979 | [A] - YE YANG ET AL, "Effect of skin and fat layers on the spatial sensitivity profile of continuous wave diffuse reflectance near-infrared spectra", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, US, (20051109), vol. 6007, doi:10.1117/12.630683, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 60070M/1 - 60070M/9, XP009156945 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.630683 | International search | [Y]US5297548 (POLOGE JONAS A [US]); | [Y]US5490506 (TAKATANI SETSUO [US], et al); | [X]US5517987 (TSUCHIYA YUTAKA [JP]); | [Y]US5931779 (ARAKAKI LORILEE S [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2006116569 | - YANG ET AL., OPTICS LETTERS, (20050901), vol. 30, no. 17, pages 2269 - 2271 |