EP2143147 - RECEPTACLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huber+Suhner AG Degersheimerstrasse 14 9100 Herisau / CH | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMBERG, Thomas Spitzweg 15 CH-8404 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
WATRINET, Hanns Mühlestrasse 24 CH-8733 Eschenbach / CH | 03 /
GÖLDI, Max Dorfstrasse 54 CH-8330 Pfäffikon / CH | 04 /
LEU, Sylvère Humbelrain 6 CH-8824 Schönenberg / CH | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Rentsch Partner AG Assoc. No. 254 Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 9 P.O. Box 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/39] | Rentsch Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2010/02] | Rentsch & Partner Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07816290.6 | 03.12.2007 | [2010/02] | WO2007CH00607 | Priority number, date | CH20070000613 | 13.04.2007 Original published format: CH 6132007 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008124951 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143147 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2143147 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/048 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
H01R13/502 (EP,US);
H01R13/52 (EP,US);
H02S40/34 (EP,US);
H02S40/345 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSDOSEN | [2010/02] | English: | RECEPTACLES | [2010/02] | French: | BOÎTES DE CONNEXIONS | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | HU | 28.09.2011 | IE | 28.09.2011 | LT | 28.09.2011 | LV | 28.09.2011 | MT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | PL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | LU | 03.12.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | GB | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | IS | 28.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9312636 (UNITED SOLAR SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0793278 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 6, lines 44-59 * * column 8, lines 5-26 * * column 9, lines 30-37 * * column 10, lines 47-59 * * column 11, lines 6-17; figure -; claim - * [A] 5-12; | [A]DE10334935 (HARTING ELECTRIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [XA]JP2005033229 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-12; | [A]DE202005007592U (RUNGE ANDRE [DE], et al) [A] 6,7* figure -; claim - *; | [A]JP2006073990 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006074561 (MULTI HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 8 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0999601 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |