EP2164214 - A CHANNEL ESTIMATION METHOD OF THE MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM BASED ON THE TIME DIVISION PILOT FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/02] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Guoping ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
XIN, Yu ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
REN, Liang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Xin ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Dacheng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/02] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
XU, Guoping ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
02 /
XIN, Yu ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
03 /
REN, Liang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Xin ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
05 /
YANG, Dacheng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2019/02] |
Former [2013/13] | Ahner, Philippe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2011/39] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2010/11] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07816853.1 | 16.11.2007 | [2010/11] | WO2007CN03247 | Priority number, date | CN20071075806 | 04.07.2007 Original published format: CN200710075806 | [2010/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009003327 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2164214 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2164214 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04L27/26 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H04L25/0228 (EP,US);
H04L25/0212 (EP,US);
H04L25/022 (EP,US);
H04L25/0226 (EP,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/11] | H04L25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2010/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KANALSCHÄTZUNGSVERFAHREN EINES MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMS AUF DER BASIS DES ZEITMULTIPLEX-PILOTFELDS | [2010/11] | English: | A CHANNEL ESTIMATION METHOD OF THE MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM BASED ON THE TIME DIVISION PILOT FIELD | [2010/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE CANAL DU SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, BASÉ SUR LE CHAMP PILOTE À RÉPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2010 | Translation filed | 22.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 07.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2007 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.11.2007 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - TAKEDA K ET AL, "Pilot-assisted Channel Estimation Based on MMSE Criterion for DS-CDMA with Frequency-domain Equalization", IEEE 61ST VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE - VTC2005, NJ, USA, (20050530), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/VETECS.2005.1543330, ISBN 978-0-7803-8887-1, pages 447 - 451, XP010855433 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * Section I-V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2005.1543330 | [X] - ADACHI F ET AL, "Modulation, coding and signal processing for wireless communications - broadband CDMA techniques", IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, NJ, US, (20050401), vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MWC.2005.1421924, ISSN 1536-1284, pages 8 - 18, XP011130569 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 8 - page 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWC.2005.1421924 | [A] - DAVID FALCONER ET AL, "Frequency Domain Equalization for Single-Carrier Broadband Wireless Systems", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, NJ, US, (20020401), vol. 40, no. 4, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 58 - 66, XP011092809 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 58 - page 65 * | International search | [Y]CN1527513 (BEIJING SAMSUNG COMM TECHN RES [CN]) [Y] 1-9 * , see the description page 10 line 11-page 11 line 5, Fig.2A, 2B *; | [Y]KR20060001646 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [Y] 1-9 * , see the abstract *; | [A]CN1747462 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *; | [A]JP2007013310 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-9* , the whole document *; | [Y]CN1909526 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 4, 5 * , see the description page 6 line 7-18, Claim 1, 2, Fig.3 * |