|
02.09.2021 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2021 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.08.2021 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2021 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2021 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.07.2021 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
22.06.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2021 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.04.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.04.2021 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.06.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.03.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.06.2016 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
126 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
75 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Correction to published European patent application/patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Correction to published European patent application/patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
13.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
11.02.2009 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.02.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.02.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.02.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
30.10.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.2008 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |