EP2095591 - OFDM communication system with fast frequency hops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/36] | OFDM COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH FAST FREQUENCY HOPS | ||
[2015/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, MT, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 Munich / DE | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 Munich / DE | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNGNICKEL, Volker Stechlinstr. 3 10318 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHULZ, Egon Wittenberger Str. 3 80993 München / DE | 03 /
ZIRWAS, Wolfgang Rohrsängerplz. 7b 81249 München / DE | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Weidel, Gottfried, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG CEF T&I IPR Patent Administration 80240 Munich / DE | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 07821077.0 | 09.10.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007EP60708 | Priority number, date | DE20061047978 | 10.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006047978 | [2009/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008043757 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2095591 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2095591 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
H04L27/2626 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | OFDM Kommunikationssystem mit schnellen Frequenzsprüngen | [2015/02] | English: | OFDM communication system with fast frequency hops | [2015/02] | French: | Système de communication OFDM avec sauts de fréquence rapides | [2015/02] |
Former [2009/36] | OFDM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT SCHNELLEN FREQUENZSPRÜNGEN | ||
Former [2009/36] | OFDM COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH FAST FREQUENCY HOPS | ||
Former [2009/36] | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION OFDM AVEC SAUTS DE FRÉQUENCE RAPIDES | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2014 | 09.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2007 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | AT | 09.10.2015 | IE | 09.10.2015 | LU | 09.10.2015 | BE | 31.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/18] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
AT | 09.10.2015 | ||
IE | 09.10.2015 | ||
LU | 09.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
IE | 09.10.2015 | ||
LU | 09.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005099146 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-14 * figures 6-8 ** page 11, line 21 - page 18, line 21 *; | [X] - SCHOLAND T ET AL, "Fast frequency hopping OFDM concept", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20050623), vol. 41, no. 13, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 748 - 749, XP006024654 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20050644 |