EP2063880 - COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMAC 12, rue Condorcet 33150 Cenon / FR | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEFFARD, Michel 200 avenue de Thouars F-33400 Talence / FR | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Cenatiempo, Julie Adeline Anne Société Aquinov Allée de la Forestière 33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Cenatiempo, Julie Adeline Anne Société Aquinov Allée de la Forestière F-33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823842.5 | 17.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007FR51947 | Priority number, date | FR20060053789 | 18.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0653789 | [2009/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008035001 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063880 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/198, A61K31/185, A61K31/20, A61K31/201, A61K31/203, A61K38/04, A61P25/28, A61P21/00 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/185 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61K31/201 (EP,US);
A61K31/203 (EP,US);
A61K38/04 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/201, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/203, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON AMYOTROPHER LATERALSKLEROSE | [2009/23] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS | [2009/23] | French: | COMPOSITION DESTINEE AU TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLEROSE LATERALE AMYOTROPHIQUE | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR2727117 (GEFFARD MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * pages 21-22; example 2 * * claims 1-7 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 4 * * page 2, lines 22-25 * [A] 5; | [X]WO9615810 (GEFFARD MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * sentence 1 * * page 3, lines 22-32 * * pages 21-22; example 2 *; | [PX]WO2006125930 (GEMAC [FR], et al) [PX] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [PX]FR2886153 (GEMAC SA [FR]) [PX] 1,2 * page 6, lines 9-11; claims 1,2,11 * * pages 8-9; example 1 *; | [A] - JACKSON M ET AL, "THERAPEUTIC DEVELOPMENTS IN THE TREATMENT OF AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB, (20021001), vol. 11, no. 10, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 1343 - 1364, XP008035103 [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.11.10.1343 |