|
08.04.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2022 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2022 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.03.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.03.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.03.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.03.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.04.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.02.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
25.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
01.03.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
55 |
|
29.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Annex |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Complaint letter by applicant |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
35 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
35 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
36 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.04.2011 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.04.2011 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.09.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
14 |