EP2047647 - USER-INITIATED COMMUNICATIONS DURING MULTIMEDIA CONTENT PLAYBACK ON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S. Aqua Semiconductor, LLC 2711 Centerville Road Suite 400 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [2017/10] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states VideoPression LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEW, Gregory, T.h 833 Carmel Avenue Albany, CA 94706 / US | 02 /
PILCHER, Donald, J. 165 Troon Way Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | 03 /
THORTON, Kevin 10340 Lockwood Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2010/23] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07840619.6 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US74887 | Priority number, date | US20060820969P | 01.08.2006 Original published format: US 820969 P | US20060560331 | 15.11.2006 Original published format: US 560331 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008016936 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047647 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047647 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04M1/725 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/72445 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (KR);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M1/72442 (EP,US);
H04M1/72466 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | H04L12/58, H04M1/725, H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BENUTZERINITIIERTE KOMMUNIKATIONEN WÄHREND DER ABSPIELUNG VON MULTIMEDIA-INHALTEN AUF EINER MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/16] | English: | USER-INITIATED COMMUNICATIONS DURING MULTIMEDIA CONTENT PLAYBACK ON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE | [2009/16] | French: | COMMUNICATIONS INITIÉES PAR L'UTILISATEUR PENDANT UNE LECTURE DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 05.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2007 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | IE | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | LU | 31.07.2017 | MT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 31.07.2007 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 31.07.2017 | ||
MT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.07.2007 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 31.07.2017 | ||
MT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 31.07.2017 | ||
MT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 31.07.2017 | ||
MT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005036859 (FREEFONE INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0037] - [0040] , [0041] , [0045] , [0047] - [0049] * * figures 1,5-7 *[I] 3,5,10,12,13 | International search | [X]US2003013483 (AUSEMS MICHIEL R [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2005036859 |