EP2068739 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DESTRUCTION OF CANCER CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lazure Technologies, LLC 13 Eagles Nest Drive LaConner, Washington 98257 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Lazure Technologies, LLC 13 Eagles Nest Drive LaConnor, Washington 98257 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZURE, Larry 13 Eagles Nest Drive Laconnor, Washington 98257 / US | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07842548.5 | 14.09.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007US78562 | Priority number, date | US20060825660P | 14.09.2006 Original published format: US 825660 P | US20060863484P | 30.10.2006 Original published format: US 863484 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008034103 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2068739 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (US);
A61N1/06 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/1407 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1425 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZERSTÖRUNG VON KREBSZELLEN | [2009/25] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DESTRUCTION OF CANCER CELLS | [2009/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DESTRUCTION DE CELLULES CANCÉREUSES | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 30.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/38] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/38] | Appeal following examination | 08.02.2016 | Appeal received No. T1051/16 | 07.04.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.08.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6235023 (LEE KEE S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - column 7, line 6 *; | [X]WO9604860 (ZOMED INT INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - page 7, line 29 * * page 9, line 24 - page 13, line 30 *; | [X]US2003130711 (PEARSON ROBERT M [US] ET AL) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0 58] - [0086] * | International search | [X]US2005171574 ; | [Y]US6246912 ; | [A]US6853864 |