|
02.12.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.11.2014 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
53 |
|
23.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Description |
Appeal |
21 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Request for consolidation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
15 |