|
25.02.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
01.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
24 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.06.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.12.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
84 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
76 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
62 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
78 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
22.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.12.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
34 |