|
10.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
26.04.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.04.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2018 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.09.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.08.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.02.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
26 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
211 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.11.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
211 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2011 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |