|
25.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
09.04.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
14 |
|
18.01.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.09.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
29.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.12.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
21 |