EP2095250 - WIRELESS SERVER BASED TEXT TO SPEECH EMAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuance Communications, Inc. 1 Wayside Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Nuance Communication, Inc. 8118 Corporate Way Suite 155 Mason OH 45040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNS, Stephen S. 967 Sherwood Forest Ln. Maineville, OH 45039-7754 / US | 02 /
KOWITZ, Mickey W. 8119 Leeshore Drive Maineville, OH 45039 / US | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
BURNS, Stephen S. 10657 Fallsi Road Loveland, OH 45140 / US | ||
02 /
KOWITZ, Mickey W. 8119 Leeshore Drive Maineville, OH 45039 / US | Representative(s) | Guy, Elizabeth, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2014/46] |
Former [2009/36] | Moir, Elizabeth, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place GB-London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07862510.0 | 04.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007US24865 | Priority number, date | US20060872862P | 05.12.2006 Original published format: US 872862 P | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008070094 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2095250 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2095250 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/18, H04L12/58 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
G10L13/08 (US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | G06F15/16, H04L12/58 | ||
Former IPC [2009/36] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | TEXT-ZU-SPRACHE-E-MAIL AUF DER BASIS EINES DRAHTLOSEN SERVERS | [2009/36] | English: | WIRELESS SERVER BASED TEXT TO SPEECH EMAIL | [2009/36] | French: | MESSAGERIE ÉLECTRONIQUE CONVERTISSANT DES MESSAGES TEXTE EN PAROLE, BASÉE SUR UN SERVEUR SANS FIL | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 03.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2014 | 27.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2007 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | ES | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | IT | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | IE | 04.12.2014 | LU | 04.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.12.2007 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5715370 (LUTHER WILLIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-11* column 1 - column 6; figures 1-4 *; | [XYI]WO9965256 (LOGICA INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 1 * * page 4 - page 7 * * page 10 - page 12 * * page 14 - page 17 * * page 23; figure 2; claims 1-18 * [Y] 8,10 [I] 3-7,9,11; | [XAY]EP1113631 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0132]; figures 1,9,10,12,13; claims 1-19 * [A] 4-9,11 [Y] 10; | [XAI]US2002055350 (GUPTE ASH [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0053] * [A] 5-11 [I] 4; | [XAYI]WO02076120 (FAMOICE TECHNOLOGY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3 * * page 5 - page 7 * * page 9 - page 11 * * page 18 - page 19 * * page 23 - page 25; figures 11,12; claims 1-24 * [A] 9-11 [Y] 8 [I] 3-7; | [XAI]US6621892 (BANISTER SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1 - column 8 * [A] 8-11 [I] 2-7 | International search | [A]US2003012348 (SKLADMAN JULIA [US], et al); | [A]US2003065724 (CLARK JONATHAN [US]); | [A]US6621892 (BANISTER SCOTT [US], et al); | [X]US2006047767 (DODRILL LEWIS D [US], et al) | by applicant | US5715370 | WO9965256 | EP1113631 | US2002055350 | WO02076120 | US6621892 |