|
26.03.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2020 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2020 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
21.01.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
31.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
24 |
|
18.05.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
15 |
|
17.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.06.2017 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.07.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
19 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
16 |
|
06.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
17 |
|
16.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.07.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
211 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
219 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
536 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.06.2014 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
12.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
85 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Notification of withdrawal of international application or designations |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
47 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |