blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2100149

EP2100149 - LIQUID WASTE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2014
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 07.10.2015  [2015/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/38]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAJAGOPAL, Ganesh
2116 McCoy Road
Carrollton, Texas 75006-2944 / US
02 / WHITT, James W.
1077 CR 2261
Valley View, Texas 76272 / US
03 / BERRYMAN, GeDon G.
3951 Kirby Drive
521
Forth Worth, Texas 76155 / US
04 / LAINS, Daniel H.
115 Highland Meadow Circle
Coppell, Texas 75019 / US
05 / OCHRANEK, Brian L.
2803 Yorkshire Lane
Southlake, Texas / US
06 / BLACKWELL, Gregory A.
12106 Forestwood Circle
Dallas, Texas 75244 / US
07 / LUOMA, Robert P. II
4300 Shadow Ridge Drive
Colleyville, Texas 76034 / US
08 / RAMSEY, Jack F.
829 Lochmoor
Highland Village, Texas 75077 / US
 [2013/27]
Former [2009/48]01 / RAJAGOPAL, Ganesh
2116 McCoy Road
Carrollton, Texas 75006-2944 / US
02 / WHITT, James W.
1077 CR 2261
Valley View, Texas 76272 / US
03 / BERRYMAN, GeDon G.
3951 Kirby Drive 521
Forth Worth, Texas 76155 / US
04 / LAINS, Daniel H.
115 Highland Meadow Circle
Coppell, Texas 75019 / US
05 / OCHRANEK, Brian L.
2803 Yorkshire Lane
Southlake, Texas / US
06 / BLACKWELL, Gregory A.
12106 Forestwood Circle
Dallas, Texas 75244 / US
07 / LUOMA, Robert P. II
4300 Shadow Ridge Drive
Colleyville, Texas 76034 / US
08 / RAMSEY, Jack F.
829 Lochmoor
Highland Village, Texas 75077 / US
Former [2009/38]01 / RAJAGOPAL, Ganesh
2116 McCoy Road
Carrollton, Texas 75006-2944 / US
02 / WHITT, James W.
1077 CR 2261
Valley View, Texas 76272 / US
03 / BERRYMAN, GeDon G.
3951 Kirby Drive 521
Forth Worth, Texas 76155 / US
04 / LAINS, Daniel H.
155 Highland Meadow Circle
Coppell, Texas 75019 / US
05 / OCHRANEK, Brian L.
2803 Yorkshire Lane
Southlake, Texas / US
06 / BLACKWELL, Gregory A.
12106 Forestwood Circle
Dallas, Texas 75244 / US
07 / LUOMA, Robert P. II
4300 Shadow Ridge Drive
Colleyville, Texas 76034 / US
08 / RAMSEY, Jack F.
829 Lochmoor
Highland Village, Texas 75077 / US
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/27]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/38]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/36]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07865079.303.12.2007
[2009/38]
WO2007US86216
Priority number, dateUS2006064408622.12.2006         Original published format: US 644086
[2009/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008079598
Date:03.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2100149
Date:16.09.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2100149
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2008
ClassificationIPC:G01N35/00
[2013/02]
CPC:
G01N35/00 (EP,US); B01L13/00 (EP,US); B01L9/52 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0496 (EP,US); G01N35/1004 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2009/38]G01N35/00, B01L11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/38]
Extension statesAL16.07.2009
BA16.07.2009
HR16.07.2009
MK16.07.2009
RS16.07.2009
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGABFALLENTSORGUNGSSYSTEM[2009/38]
English:LIQUID WASTE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM[2009/38]
French:SYSTEME DE GESTION DE DECHETS LIQUIDES[2013/07]
Former [2009/38]SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE DÉCHETS LIQUIDES
Entry into regional phase16.07.2009National basic fee paid 
16.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
04.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2012Date of oral proceedings
11.01.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2013Fee for grant paid
16.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.11.2009
Opposition(s)04.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.12.2007
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE03.12.2013
LU03.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU03.12.2007
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE03.12.2013
LU03.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2015/32]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE03.12.2013
LU03.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE03.12.2013
LU03.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
LU03.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
LU03.12.2013
Former [2014/23]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/14]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2013/49]SI03.07.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB2225223  (FLOW LAB [GB]) [X] 1-6,8-23 * page 9, line 15 - page 11, line 35; figures 20-22 * * page 30, line 14 - page 32, line 2 * [Y] 7;
 [Y]EP0355823  (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 7 * page 6, line 36 - line 39 *;
 [A]WO2005033714  (GYROS AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 17, line 30 - page 19, line 23 *;
 [A]WO9310454  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 11, line 28 - page 12, line 21 *
ExaminationSU1222886
by applicantGB2225223
 EP0355823
 WO2005033714
 WO9310454
 SU1222886
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.