|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
01.10.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.01.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2010 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
26 |