EP2108107 - CAUSTIC RESISTANT MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema Inc. 900 First Avenue, Bldg. 4-2. King Of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/42] | For all designated states Arkema Inc. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSAR, Walter 1324 Dimity Court Pottstown, PA 19465 / US | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Albani, Dalila ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/42] | Albani, Dalila Arkema France Propriete Industrielle 420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 07875237.5 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/42] | WO2007US82795 | Priority number, date | US20060860374P | 21.11.2006 Original published format: US 860374 P | [2009/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009091351 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2108107 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2108107 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01H3/04 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
B01D71/34 (EP,US);
C08L27/16 (CN);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D71/40 (EP);
B01D71/4011 (US);
B01D71/80 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (CN);
B01D2325/30 (EP,US);
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
C08J2327/16 (CN);
C08J2433/12 (CN);
C08J2471/00 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08L27/16, C08L33/12, C08L71/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2009/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KAUSTISCH BESTÄNDIGE MEMBRAN | [2019/49] | English: | CAUSTIC RESISTANT MEMBRANE | [2009/42] | French: | MEMBRANE RESISTANTE EN MILIEU CAUSTIQUE | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/42] | CAUSTISCH BESTÄNDIGE MEMBRAN | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 27.06.2014 | Observations by third parties | 21.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2007 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | GB | 29.10.2020 | IE | 29.10.2020 | LU | 29.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
IE | 29.10.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
IE | 29.10.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 08.04.2020 | |
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06306239 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *; | [X]EP1520874 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0102] *; | [X]JP2006205067 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,3,4,9,15 * abstract *; | [XY] - PEREIRA NUNES S ET AL, "ULTRAFILTRATION MEMBRANES FROM PVDF/PMMA BLENDS", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (19921002), vol. 73, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0376-7388(92)80183-K, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 25 - 35, XP000360345 [X] 1,3-7,9,15 * the whole document * [Y] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0376-7388(92)80183-K | [X] - HESTER J F ET AL, "Design and performance of foul-resistant poly(vinylidene fluoride) membranes prepared in a single-step by surface segregation", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20020615), vol. 202, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0376-7388(01)00735-9, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 119 - 135, XP004351130 [X] 1,3-7,9,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(01)00735-9 | [X] - OCHOA N A ET AL, "Effect of hydrophilicity on fouling of an emulsified oil wastewater with PVDF/PMMA membranes", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20031201), vol. 226, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MEMSCI.2003.09.004, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 203 - 211, XP004473661 [X] 1,3,4,9,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.memsci.2003.09.004 | [Y] - MOKRINI A ET AL, "Partially fluorinated proton exchange membranes based on PVDF-SEBS blends compatibilized with methylmethacrylate block copolymers", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 283, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MEMSCI.2006.06.032, ISSN 0376-7388, (20061020), pages 74 - 83, (20061020), XP024931745 [Y] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.memsci.2006.06.032 | International search | [Y]US3178399 (LO ELIZABETH S) [Y] 4 * . col 7, In 5-10 *; | [Y]US5066401 (MUELLER HEINZ-JOACHIM [DE], et al) [Y] 2, 8, 18, 19 * , Abstract; col 3, In 2-4; col 3, In 4-5; col 2, Ins 55-68; col 5, Ins 48-53, 63-68 *; | [Y]US2004014849 (JOANICOT MATHIEU [FR], et al) [Y] 10, 11 * , para [0037]; [0044]; [0047]; [0143] *; | [XY]US6872781 (HEDHLI LOTFI [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 5, 13, 14-17 * , Abstract; col 1, Ins 36-39; col 3. Ins 48-50; col 4, Ins 16-22, 32-47, 53-56; col 5, Ins 18-25. 45-52, 64; col 6. Ins 26-30; 43-44; col 6. Ins 36-40; col 9, Ins 37-42; col 10, Ins 28-30; Tables 1, 4.5; Exemples 10-11 * [Y] 2, 4, 6-12, 18, 19; | [Y]US2006030685 (PASSADE BOUPAT NICOLAS [FR], et al) [Y] 6, 7, 9, 12* , para [0014] [0028]; [0037]-[0039]; [0144]; [0148]; [0208] * | other | JP2006205067K | JPH06306239K | JPH06306239 | JP2006205067 | - OCHOA N.A. ET AL, "EFFECT OF HYDROPHILICITY ON FOULING OF AN EMULSIFIED OIL WASTEWATER WITH PVDF/PMMA MEMBRANES", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (200312), vol. 226, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MEMSCI.2003.09.004, pages 203 - 211, XP004473661 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.memsci.2003.09.004 | - SOLVAY, "HIGH-PERFORMANCE POLYMERS FOR MEMBRANES", BROCHURE SOLVAY ADVANCE POLYMERS, VERSION 1.0, (2007), XP003036031 |