|
12.10.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.09.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.05.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.02.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
29 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.03.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
23.01.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.11.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.07.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |