EP2104179 - Satellite transceiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS, TR Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SES Astra S.A. 6815 Château de Betzdorf / LU | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grotz, Joel SES Astra S.A. 6815 Château de Betzdorf / LU | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/08] |
Former [2009/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005308.5 | 20.03.2008 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2104179 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104179 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q25/00, H04B1/18, H04H40/90 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H01Q1/247 (EP,US);
H01Q25/001 (EP,US);
H04B1/18 (EP,US);
H04H40/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 23.03.2010 | BA | 23.03.2010 | MK | 23.03.2010 | RS | 23.03.2010 | Title | German: | Satellitensendeempfänger | [2009/39] | English: | Satellite transceiver | [2009/39] | French: | Émetteur-récepteur satellite | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2011 | 31.03.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2008 | AT | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.03.2008 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0416264 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [Y] 3,4,8,9,14,16,17 * column 3, line 43 - column 9, line 5 ** figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US5568158 (GOULD HARRY J [US]) [DA] 1,3,4,8,9,14,16,17 * column 3, line 50 - column 6, line 64 * * figures 1A-1C,2A,2B,4 *; | [A]EP1089469 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0046] - [0071] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2007019117 (NAKANO YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0051] - [0062] * * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2007084389 (MEDIAUR TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-13,15 * page 19, line 17 - page 20, line 25 * * figures 10-5 * [Y] 3,4,8,9,14,16,17 | by applicant | US5568158 | - J. H. WINTERS, "Optimum Combining in Digital Mobile Radio with Cochannel Interference", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (198407), vol. SAC-2, no. 4 |