EP1988369 - Device and method for displaying measurements and shrink tunnel for a packaging machine and packaging machine with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multivac Sepp Haggenmüller GmbH & Co. KG Bahnhofstrasse 4 87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE | [2009/47] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Multivac Sepp Haggenmüller GmbH & Co. KG Bahnhofstr. 4 87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jokele, Bernd Immenstaedter Strasse 48 87435 Kempten / DE | 02 /
Moessnang, Konrad Illerstrasse 29 87435 Kempten / DE | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/42] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/45] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006355.5 | 31.03.2008 | [2008/45] | Priority number, date | DE20071020392 | 30.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007020392 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1988369 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1988369 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01D7/08, G01D13/24 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
G01D7/08 (EP,US);
G01D13/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | G01D7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Anzeigen von Messwerten sowie Schrumpftunnel für eine Verpackungsmachine bzw. Verpackungsmachine mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2008/45] | English: | Device and method for displaying measurements and shrink tunnel for a packaging machine and packaging machine with such a device | [2008/45] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'affichage de valeurs de mesure et tunnel à rétrécissement pour une machine d'emballage ou machine d'emballage dotée d'un tel dispositif | [2008/45] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | HR | 18.11.2009 | IE | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | LV | 18.11.2009 | MT | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | NO | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | ES | 28.02.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | FR | 31.03.2010 | LU | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | PT | 18.04.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3377770 (RORER DONALD R) [A] 11-14* figure 1 *; | [Y]US4472921 (JONES STEPHEN H [US]) [Y] 11-14 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH11227714 (TOYO JIDOKI KK) [Y] 11-14 * abstract *; | [XY]NL1013038C (FRANSISCUS GERARDUS SANDERS [NL]) [X] 1-10 * pages 1-2; figure 1 * [Y] 11-14; | [X]US2004262410 (HULL GERRY G [US]) [X] 5,10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0017]; figures 4,6 *; | [XY]US2007045444 (GRAY TONY [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0015] - [0049] * [Y] 11-14 | by applicant | US2007045444 |