EP1986125 - Method and system for detecting changes in sensor sample streams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2019/02] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nikovski, Daniel N. 100 Memorial DR Unit 2-3B Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
Jain, Ankur 217 Thorndike St., Apt. N°. 308 Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2019/02] |
Former [2008/44] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006504.8 | 31.03.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | US20070738562 | 23.04.2007 Original published format: US 738562 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1986125 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1986125 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1986125 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G06F18/00 (EP,US);
G06F2218/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/32] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Erkennung von Veränderungen in Sensorprobeströmen | [2008/44] | English: | Method and system for detecting changes in sensor sample streams | [2008/44] | French: | Procédé et système pour détecter des changements dans des flux d'échantillons de capteur | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 31.05.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ULZIITUGS BUD ET AL, "Distance Functions to Detect Changes in Data Streams", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEMS, XX, KR, vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1738-8899, (20060301), pages 44 - 47, URL: http://jips-k.org/dlibrary/JIPS_v02_no1_paper9.pdf, (20111016), XP008143839 [A] 1-11 * page 45, paragraph 3 * | [A] - D Kifer ET AL, "Detecting Change in Data Streams", Proceedings 2004 VLDB Conference, Elsevier, (20040101), pages 180 - 191, ISBN 978-0-12-088469-8, XP055008718 [A] 1-11 * page 182, paragraph 2 - column r, line 36 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-012088469-8/50019-X | by applicant | - "Continuous Inspection Schemes", BIOMETRIKA, (1954), vol. 41, pages 100 - 114 | - "Streaming and sublinear approximation of entropy and information distances", GUHA ET AL., Proceedings of SODA'06, ACM PRESS, (2006), pages 733 - 742 | - PARZEN, "On estimation of a probability density function and mode", ANN. MATH. STAT., (1962), vol. 33, pages 1065 - 1076, XP008051219 |