EP1990817 - Illuminable film keyboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Werner Blase GmbH & Co. KG Borsigstrasse 8 32312 Lübbecke / DE | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedrich, Joachim Grüner Weg 58 32120 Hiddenhausen / DE | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried Karthäuser Strasse 5A 34117 Kassel / DE | [2008/46] | Application number, filing date | 08008244.9 | 30.04.2008 | [2008/46] | Priority number, date | DE20072006647U | 07.05.2007 Original published format: DE 202007006647 U | [2008/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990817 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/83 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
H01H13/83 (EP);
H01H2209/082 (EP);
H01H2209/084 (EP);
H01H2219/037 (EP);
H01H2219/046 (EP);
H01H2221/07 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | Beleuchtbare Folientastatur | [2008/46] | English: | Illuminable film keyboard | [2008/46] | French: | Clavier à effleurement pouvant être éclairé | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007023262 (LIU DEAN-KUO [TW], et al) [X] 1-9,12 * paragraphs [0033] - [0045]; figure 4 * [Y] 10,11; | [Y]US2004173811 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [Y] 10,11 * paragraphs [0145] - [0148]; figures 1,16 *; | [X]EP1152443 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,7,12 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figures 11,12 * | by applicant | DE29703194U | DE202004016741U | DE202004017365U | DE202004007474U |